Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - Required
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale and Carr
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of a public record to provide a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record to an applicant under specified circumstances; authorizing a person or governmental unit that is not provided with a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record to file a complaint with a specified circuit court; authorizing the court to take specified action regarding the failure to provide a copy, printout, or photograph of a public record; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
7/24/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756484/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 7/24/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {756484/1 Report Adopted 27
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-205, 4-362 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM