Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the clerk of a circuit court may charge a reasonable fee set by the State Court Administrator and not to exceed $60 for recording an affidavit of affixation or an affidavit of severance for a manufactured home.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0063
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882317/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {882317/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8B-202, 8B-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM