Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video Cameras
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to install and maintain at least two operational video cameras in specified school locations for the purpose of recording illegal activity; requiring the board to retain specified video recordings for at least 6 months; and requiring the board to adopt specified regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2016
Legislative Date
10/13/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video Cameras
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2016 10/13/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video Cameras
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-440 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM