Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Fisher, Jackson, Morgan, and Rey
Status
In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing for archery hunters in Calvert and St. Mary's counties a safety zone of 50 yards within which archery hunting may not take place except under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274439/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Delegates Stein, O'Donnell, and Holmes
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted 42
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {274439/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Delegates Stein, O'Donnell, and Holmes 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM