Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "ignition interlock system" to require that an ignition interlock system be equipped with a camera capable of recording still images of the person taking the test of the person's blood alcohol level; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422711/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition
House 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {422711/1 Adopted 36
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-902.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM