Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - Studies
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Kaiser, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Morhaim, Platt, Rosenberg, Stein, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to study the creation of a potential Pay It Forward Pilot Program; requiring the study to consider specified items; requiring the Board of Regents to study whether public institutions of higher education could successfully implement specified tuition freeze programs; providing for the termination of the Act; and requiring the Board of Regents to report its findings and recommendations on the potential programs on or before December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0237
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0853 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM