Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a carrier from imposing a premium rate increase for a policy or contract of long-term care insurance that exceeds 20% within a 12-month period; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/03/2017
Legislative Date
11/03/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/03/2017 11/03/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates - Limitation
House 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page