Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified exception to the prohibition against carrying a deadly weapon on public school property; repealing the prohibition on the possession or use of specified firearm ammunition during and in relation to the commission of a crime of violence; altering the authorization for a person to wear, carry, or transport a handgun; repealing the designation of specified firearms as assault weapons; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/01/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/01/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102, 4-110, 4-203, 4-301 through 4-306 )
(   3-208, 5-101, 5-110, 5-114, 5-115, 5-117.1, 5-118, 5-119, 5-120, 5-133, 5-133.1, 5-133.2, 5-133.3, 5-143, 5-144, 5-145, 5-146, 5-205, 5-206, 5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM