Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Certificate of Qualification, Licensing, and Registration - Electronic Means
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the renewal date and process for renewing certificates of qualification of surplus lines brokers; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to send a specified notice relating to renewal of the certificate of qualification of a surplus lines broker, the license of an insurance producer, an insurance adviser, and a motor club, and the registration of a motor club representative at the electronic mail address of the holder of record; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Finance 33
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-115, 10-117, 10-211, 26-206, 26-305, 3-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM