Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers
Sponsored by
Delegate Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a specified application of law in Anne Arundel County to allow specified license holders to sell wine for consumption off the licensed premises in refillable containers of a specified capacity; and making specified licensing requirements for refillable beer containers applicable to refillable wine containers authorized under the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
7/24/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 7/24/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM