Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the names of certain candidates for election be listed in alphabetical order by surname; requiring a local board of elections to conduct a random drawing of the names of the candidates for election to determine the order of the names on the ballot; requiring the drawing to be conducted in the manner required by the State Board of Elections; defining "candidate" to include a Governor and Lieutenant Governor unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2017
Legislative Date
10/20/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2017 10/20/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM