Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an appraisal management company to pay the appraiser for each appraisal or valuation assignment, except under certain circumstances; decreasing from 60 to 45 the number of days after the completion of each certain appraisal or valuation assignment during which an appraisal management company must pay the appraiser, except under certain circumstances; and authorizing the Commission to bring disciplinary action for violation of a certain provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/11/2017
Legislative Date
10/11/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463294/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/11/2017 10/11/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {463294/1 Adopted 10
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Text - Third - Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 12
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Referred Finance 13
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {547879/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Text - Chapter - Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM