Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators by repealing the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring that a preliminary evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations relating to the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2024.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0059
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/22/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2015 1/22/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 33
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Finance 33
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM