Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Metzgar, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to implement specified programs to provide discounted licenses, stamps, and permits to Maryland residents who are recipients of the Purple Heart Award; requiring the Department to submit a report on the number of specified licenses, stamps, and permits issued to Purple Heart recipients to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing - Complimentary Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {380018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {973323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing - Complimentary Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {380018/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {134632/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {973323/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text - Chapter - Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart Recipients
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-303, 4-604, 4-607, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM