Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Toll Civil Penalty - Distribution to the General Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain trust agreements that secure revenue bonds issued by the Maryland Transportation Authority from pledging or assigning revenues attributable to video toll civil penalties; requiring that, after deducting the reasonable costs of administering the video toll program, revenue attributable to certain civil penalties be paid to the General Fund of the State; providing that a certain distribution of revenue applies only after certain revenue bonds are no longer outstanding and unpaid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/09/2017
Legislative Date
8/09/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/09/2017 8/09/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Toll Civil Penalty - Distribution to the General Fund
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1414, 4-311, 4-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM