Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Smigiel, Kramer, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, S. Robinson, Stocksdale, Valderrama, and Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; prohibiting a judge in a jury trial from making a specified ruling before the jury returns a verdict; establishing that the owner of a dog is liable for injury, death, or loss caused by a dog while the dog is running at large; establishing exceptions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0247
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/08/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {442019/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted (44-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/08/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {442019/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/28/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted (44-1) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM