Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Implementation of the Common Core State Standards - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Education and specified county boards of education from establishing specified educational policies, curriculum, and guidelines that include or are based on the Common Core State Standards; prohibiting the State Board from entering into any agreements or joining any organizations that give control over educational matters to any entity other than the State; requiring the State Board to take specified steps to rescind the State Board's adoption of the Common Core State Standards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/17/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/17/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-205.1, 4-111.1, 7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM