Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified accumulated contributions of nonvested former members to be transferred into a specified fund; clarifying that specified accumulated contributions shall be paid to specified former members under specified circumstances; requiring specified transferred accumulated contributions to be paid to specified nonvested former members from a specified fund under specified circumstances; and making conforming changes.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884561/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {884561/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 27
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 28
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 30
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 30
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM