Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified data regarding a missing child be entered into the National Crime Information Center's national database within 2 hours after the receipt of the minimum information necessary to make the entry; repealing the requirement that a law enforcement agency enter specified data regarding a missing child into a specified State database; repealing the requirement that a specified law enforcement agency forward a copy of a missing persons report to the State ClearingHouse for Missing Children; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-402, 9-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM