Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs – License Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain protest against the renewal of an opioid maintenance therapy program license by at least a certain number of certain persons; prohibiting the Secretary of Health, under certain circumstances, from approving a certain license renewal without holding a public hearing; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to post certain notice of a public hearing in a certain manner within a certain time frame; prohibiting the Secretary from approving the renewal of a certain license under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2018
Legislative Date
1/11/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2018 1/11/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health – Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs – License Renewal
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM