Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices and Accessories - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from attempting to deliver or possessing with the intent to deliver specified telecommunication devices or accessories to a person detained or confined in a specified place of confinement; prohibiting a person from depositing or concealing specified telecommunication devices or accessories in or about a place of confinement; increasing the penalty for specified subsequent violations; and requiring a specified sentence to be served consecutive to another sentence.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/13/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM