Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics Commission, Commission on Judicial Disabilities, Judicial Ethics Committee, and Joint Ethics Committee - Duties
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Judicial Ethics Committee as an alternative to the Commission on Judicial Disabilities or another body designated by a specified court, shall administer and implement specified provisions of law that apply to State officials of the Judicial Branch; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {360116/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable with Amendments {360116/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-104, 5-819 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM