Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Placement Restrictions - Repeal MC 2-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits, in Montgomery County, more than two free-play pinball machines that are not in locked storage and are available for public use from being kept on the same floor of a building.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 42
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM