Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Stormwater Management - Assessment of Local Fees, Charges, and Excise Taxes - Leasehold Interests
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Barve, and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a leasehold or other limited interest in property that is owned by the federal government, the State, a county, a municipality, or an agency or instrumentality of the federal government, the State, a county, or a municipality to be assessed a specified stormwater remediation fee, a specified stormwater management charge, or a specified stormwater management excise tax by a county or municipality under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202.1, 4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM