Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from January 1, 2017, to January 1, 2022, the termination of an income tax credit that specified individuals or corporations may claim against the State income tax for costs incurred to obtain federal security clearances, to rent specified facilities, and to construct or renovate a sensitive compartmented information facility.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-732 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM