Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified mental health care practitioners, including physicians, professional counselors and therapists, psychologists, and social workers, from engaging in specified sexual orientation change efforts with a patient who is a minor; providing that a specified mental health care practitioner who engages in sexual orientation change efforts with a minor patient shall be considered to have committed unprofessional conduct and shall be subject to discipline by a specified licensing board; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/24/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/24/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM