Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Correctional Officer, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, B. Barnes, Branch, Kaiser, Luedtke, Smith, Turner, Vaughn, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement or correctional officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0115
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1461 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/29/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2015 1/29/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM