Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Budget and Management)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, rather than a specified unit of State government or a specified State officer, to submit specified information regarding specified capital projects to the General Assembly under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/20/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/20/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM