Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Turner, and Ebersole
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain county boards of education to remove a county superintendent of schools for immorality, misconduct in office, insubordination, incompetency, or willful neglect of duty; requiring a county superintendent who has been removed to be compensated subject to the terms of a certain contract or, if no such terms exist, for the remainder of the county superintendent's term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1603 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM