Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Montgomery County to create, by local law, a Transit Authority to perform county transit functions as an instrumentality of the county and body corporate and politic and to create a special taxing district, impose a specified special tax, specify the organization and powers of the Transit Authority, establish a specified budget process for the Transit Authority, and specify other matters related to the Transit Authority; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM