Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Detachable Magazines - Maximum Capacity for Ammunition
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Proctor, Anderson, Barkley, Braveboy, Cardin, Carr, Cullison, Feldman, Frush, Gilchrist, Glenn, Haynes, Healey, Howard, Hucker, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mitchell, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing to 10 rounds the maximum capacity for ammunition of a detachable magazine for a firearm that can be manufactured, sold, offered for sale, purchased, received, or transferred; and reducing to 10 rounds the maximum capacity for ammunition of a magazine which, when used by a person in the commission of a felony or a crime of violence, results in that person being guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to specified penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0539
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0330 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-305, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM