Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Chang, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Hettleman, Jackson, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Platt, S. Robinson, Sydnor, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a contractor or subcontractor that performs work on a construction project that receives funding from the State capital budget in the amount of $100,000 or more to be affiliated with, and to use apprentices from, an apprenticeship program that is registered with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation or the United States Department of Labor, or requiring the contractor or subcontractor to make specified payments to the State Apprenticeship Training Fund or to specified apprenticeship programs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0457
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-602, 17-6A-01 through 17-6A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM