Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Abuse of Workers' Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes, Conaway, Love, Murphy, B. Robinson, and Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a Task Force to Study Abuse of Workers' Compensation; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; providing that a member of the Task Force may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study workers' compensation fraud and abuse and make recommendations on or before December 1, 2014, concerning workers' compensation fraud and abuse prevention strategies and related legislation; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM