Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering certain penalties for a person who displays a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0020
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/12/2020
Legislative Date
6/12/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 6/12/2020 6/12/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:49 PM