Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Lafferty, Barve, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, R. Lewis, Morhaim, and Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos in the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0500
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
House 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-210.6 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM