Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Education Tax Relief for Elderly Individuals
Sponsored by
Delegate Knotts
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the portion of the county property tax that is used to fund the county board of education and is imposed on real property that is owned by and used as the principal residence of an individual who is at least 65 years old; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to provide for certain matters relating to the tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Education Tax Relief for Elderly Individuals
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Education Tax Relief for Elderly Individuals
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page