Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Assault Weapons and Detachable Magazines - Possession or Transport by Nonresident
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Kelly
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the possession or transport by a nonresident of the State of an assault weapon or a detachable magazine that has been legally purchased outside the State for the purpose of using the assault weapon or detachable magazine to participate in an organized military activity, a target shoot, formal or informal target practice, or a sport shooting event, having the assault weapon or detachable magazine repaired at a bona fide repair shop, or traveling through the State for a lawful purpose.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/09/2014 1/10/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM