Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Alteration of Dates for Termination Provisions and Sunset Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegate Krebs
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date of the termination provisions from 2016 to 2015 relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors; and altering from July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2017, the date of the requirement that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed by the Department of Legislative Services.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM