Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Manager
Sponsored by
Delegate Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public service company that is going to terminate electric or gas service to a customer who resides in a multifamily dwelling unit to notify the property owner or property manager of the multifamily dwelling unit before terminating service to the customer; requiring a public service company to provide the notice only to a property owner or property manager who enrolls in a specified service termination notification program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183095/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate Long) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 02/26 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {183095/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate Long) Adopted 31
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1 32
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Special Order until 02/26 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted 32
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1 Adopted 33
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Finance 35
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM