Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Chief Judge, Court of Appeals)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award a prevailing party reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified civil actions; requiring a court to consider specified factors in determining whether to make an award to a prevailing plaintiff; authorizing a court to award attorney's fees to a prevailing defendant only on a finding that the action was frivolous; establishing the method of calculating an award of attorney's fees under the Act or any other State statute authorizing an award of reasonable attorney's fees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0263
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1901, 3-1902, 5-302, 5-303 )
(   12-104, 12-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM