Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "school vehicle"; establishing that a "school vehicle" includes specified vehicles that meet or comply with specified standards and requirements, were originally used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, and are used only for transporting children to and from specified locations.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0159
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-154, 11-173, 11-174 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM