Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Charles County or a municipal corporation in Charles County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property that is leased by a new or expanding business that creates 10 or more full-time jobs in an industry targeted for expansion by the Charles County Economic Development Commission.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/27/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/27/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM