Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the fee that specified business entities must pay for filing a required annual report with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; exempting a person who did not own specified property during the preceding calendar year from submitting a report on personal property to the Department; requiring the person to submit an affidavit attesting that the person has no tax liability for the taxable period to the Department on or before April 15; specifying the form and contents of the affidavit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM