Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Training for Public Bodies
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a public body to designate at least one individual who is an employee, an officer, or a member of the public body to receive training on the requirements of the open meetings law; requiring the public body to submit a list of individuals designated to receive specified training to the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0047 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626089/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544833/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {626089/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {544833/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-502.4, 10-502.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM