Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator MC 17-14
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, in Montgomery County, a law enforcement agency's vehicle used for patrol by a law enforcement officer who is a first responder and trained in the operation and use of an automated external defibrillator (AED) to be equipped with an AED; and defining specified terms.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM