Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Open Meetings Act - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law governing the penalty for a violation of the Open Meetings Act; requiring the Open Meetings Compliance Board to include any suggestions the Board has concerning the penalties for violations of the Open Meetings Act in its annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly; requiring the Attorney General, in collaboration with the Board, to adopt regulations to establish additional penalties for specified violations of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-502, 10-502.1, 10-502.4, 10-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM