Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Reducing the application fee from $150 to $100 for a license to engage in the business of providing security systems services; requiring a specified applicant to pay specified fees relating to a criminal history records check; decreasing the amount of the processing fee from $150 to $100 for a specified applicant for a specified license; continuing the authority of the Secretary of State Police to license and regulate security systems agencies in the State and register security systems technicians; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0206
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293493/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Delegates Jameson, Davis, and W. Miller
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senators Conway, Zucker, and Salling
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {293493/1 Report Adopted 21
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 25
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 25
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {244331/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Delegates Jameson, Davis, and W. Miller 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senators Conway, Zucker, and Salling 65
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 72
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM