Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and related costs to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing party in a special education proceeding; prohibiting a court from awarding attorney's fees and certain related costs to a certain parent in a certain proceeding under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to award reasonable expert witness fees to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing part in a certain special education proceeding; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825167/2 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {825167/2 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM