Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries Management - Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the regulatory authority of the Department of Natural Resources to issue public notices for specified fishery management purposes; specifying the types of actions that the Department may include in a specified public notice; and providing that a public notice issued in accordance with specified regulations is not subject to Title 10, Subtitle 1 of the State Government Article.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM