Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Norman, Ready, and Stocksdale
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which seized contraband tobacco products or specified conveyances used to transport tobacco products are processed following seizure; authorizing the Comptroller to destroy contraband tobacco products seized and forfeited under specified circumstances; and requiring the Comptroller to remove seized contraband tobacco products on or before a specified date.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493694/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Reassigned to Economic Matters 11
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {493694/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-836, 13-841 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM